THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:33:01 AM
Reeve, Brenda Kathleen
CPSO#:
69353
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Nov 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5508
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:13 Aug 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRENDA KATHLEEN REEVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REEVE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 14 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 15 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 13 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2001 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 2019 |