THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:29:31 AM
Brown, Dierdre Kathleen
CPSO#:
69345
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
770 South Wenige Drive
London ON N5X 0H7
Phone: (519) 679-1717
Fax: (519) 679-1716
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Brown & Hollohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 25 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Sep 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DIERDRE KATHLEEN BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2008 |