THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:59:28 AM
Potvin, William Reginald
CPSO#:
69339
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Apr 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
72 Bridge Street
Carleton Place ON K7C 2V3
Phone: (613) 253-8192
Fax: (613) 253-2566
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Almonte General Hospital |
Almonte |
Arnprior Regional Health |
Arnprior |
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital |
Carleton Place |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:30 May 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM REGINALD POTVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTVIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Apr 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2002 |