THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:11:57 AM
Jardine, Julie Amanda
CPSO#:
69305
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jan 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jan 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
361 Waverley St
Ottawa ON K2P 0W4
Phone: 613 558-6627
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:27 Oct 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIE AMANDA JARDINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARDINE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 27 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 28 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 27 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 28 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 27 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Oct 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2001 |