THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:48:23 PM
Makar Abdel Messih, Inas Helmy
CPSO#:
69288
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Jul 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street N6A 4V2
London ontario
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 685-8281
Fax: (519) 646-6149
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:09 Jul 2007 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Aug 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 29 Aug 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Aug 2013 |
|
Active |