THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:09:06 AM
Tjon, Peter Edwin
CPSO#:
69260
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Dec 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Dec 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-3601 Highway 7
Markham ON L3R 0M3
Phone: 905-604-3336
Fax: 905-604-7750
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER EDWIN TJON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TJON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1997 |