THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:35:46 PM
Zahedi, Afshan
CPSO#:
69245
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 310
3443 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON M1W 2S1
Phone: (416) 495-1830
Fax: (416) 495-1389
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Zahedi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 29 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:07 Sep 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AFSHAN ZAHEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAHEDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1999 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1999 |