THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:49:10 AM
Little, D'Arcy Lawrence
CPSO#:
69217
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Staff Radiologist
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201 Ext. 3077
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. D'ARCY LAWRENCE LITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1999 |