THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 12:47:27 PM
Manchuk, Derek Russel
CPSO#:
69208
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Oct 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4722
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEREK RUSSEL MANCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANCHUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 04 Jan 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 05 Jan 1998 to 01 Mar 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Oct 1997 |