THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:30:29 AM
McKee, John David
CPSO#:
69203
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Mar 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John David McKee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:All patient records can be found in digital format on the shared Barrie FHO EMR. Full access was passed on to the Physician who was recruited to take over Dr. McKee's practice. Patients are free to access their records through the front desk at 201-500 Huronia Road. With the patient's signed authorization others may also access their records. A "fat client" system is used to call up one page at a time with all other existing data stored on the Accuro EMR servers in Toronto and British Columbia. However, a patient's entire EMR can be easily downloaded on a digital device or disk.
Date Received: 09 Mar 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1997 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Mar 2023 |