THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:23:11 PM
McLellan, Catherine Susan
CPSO#:
69202
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CV Lab Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-1329
Fax: (613) 548-2400
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:11 Sep 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CATHERINE SUSAN MCLELLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLELLAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1999 |