THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:46:51 PM
Michailidis, Michael
CPSO#:
69199
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jan 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jan 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Dec 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MICHAILIDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHAILIDIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2001 |