THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:30:32 PM
Ong, Alan Pang Yean
CPSO#:
69191
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 507
Toronto ON M4P 1P2
Phone: (416) 488-6980
Fax: (416) 488-3998
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALAN PANG YEAN ONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2000 |