THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:13:40 AM
Haywood, Catherine Tessa
CPSO#:
69171
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
284 Queen Street East
Suite 219
Brampton ON L6V 1C2
Phone: (905) 451-2285
Fax: (905) 451-2287
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CATHERINE TESSA HAYWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYWOOD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2000 |