THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:01:50 AM
Kreindler, David Michael
CPSO#:
69170
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Dec 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Cincinnati, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue. Room FG-62
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6030
Fax: (416) 480-6818
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: David Kreindler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 4 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL KREINDLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREINDLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Aug 2002
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2000 |