THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:02:53 AM
Rodrigue, Julie Marie
CPSO#:
69151
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Mar 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Mar 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 21
5350 Canotek Road
Ottawa ON K1J 9E2
Phone: (613) 695-5560
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIE MARIE RODRIGUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODRIGUE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Jan 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Mar 1998 |