THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:36:00 PM
Puddester, Derek Gordon
CPSO#:
69146
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Nov 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: D.G.Puddester Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 13 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 May 2021 |