THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:29:14 AM
Fuchs, Marnie Rachel
CPSO#:
69104
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Feb 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Feb 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100 Ext. 7628
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 22 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Dec 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARNIE RACHEL FUCHS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUCHS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2001 |