THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:02:34 PM
Belchetz, Lance Adam
CPSO#:
69088
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Dec 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4548
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Dec 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:08 Dec 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LANCE ADAM BELCHETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELCHETZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 1997 |