THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:41:13 AM
Cohen, Paul David
CPSO#:
69069
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 May 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON M4T 3A7
Phone: (416) 487-3453
Fax: (416) 487-5528
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:25 May 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL DAVID COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 02 Feb 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 03 Feb 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 02 Feb 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 03 Feb 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 02 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 03 Feb 1999 to 02 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 03 Feb 2000 to 02 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 03 Feb 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2001 |