THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:56:40 PM
Sabloff, Mitchell
CPSO#:
69041
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jul 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Haematology
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road Box 704
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 71284
Fax: (613) 737-8861
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:25 Sep 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MITCHELL SABLOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABLOFF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 08 Nov 2000 to 07 Nov 2001
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2001 |