THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:24:05 AM
Travers, Sean Arthur
CPSO#:
69014
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Nov 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Center
50 College Drive
P O Box 2500
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:21 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEAN ARTHUR TRAVERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAVERS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Nov 2000
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2000 |