THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 15:59:38 PM
Lever, James Patrick
CPSO#:
68999
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Arts Building
Suite 301
270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON K9J 2V4
Phone: (705) 743-3332
Fax: (705) 743-5893
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: James P. Lever Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 22 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK LEVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2001 |