THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 22:35:41 PM
MacRae, Robert Malcolm
CPSO#:
68996
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 May 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 May 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
PO Box 903
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70206
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT MALCOLM MACRAE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACRAE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2001 |