THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:03:25 PM
Hoar, Stephanie Ellen
CPSO#:
68986
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Room 5-26
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82564
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:07 Sep 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ELLEN HOAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 2000 |