THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:15:27 PM
Baetz, Tara Dawn
CPSO#:
68981
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Nov 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontar
25 King Street West
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2630 Ext. 4503
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital |
Perth |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:07 Sep 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TARA DAWN BAETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAETZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Nov 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2001 |