THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:43:20 PM
Cyr, Michael Mark
CPSO#:
68977
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1960 Appleby Line
Unit 36
Burlington ON L7L 0B7
Phone: 905-332-9292
Fax: 905-332-9244
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology |
Effective:06 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MARK CYR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Clinician Investigator
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Clinician Investigator
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
CF - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 1999 |