THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 6:37:24 AM
Wu, Louis
CPSO#:
68969
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Nov 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Nov 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Heartlake X-Ray and Ultrasound
Suite 104
10425 Kennedy Road North
Brampton ON L6Z 0A4
Phone: 905-846-7733
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LOUIS WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2001 |