THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:08:57 AM
Blumenthal, Andrea Lee
CPSO#:
68967
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jan 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jan 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 433-2733
Fax: (905) 721-6122
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:01 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREA LEE BLUMENTHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLUMENTHAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2002 |