THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:18:12 AM
Pallandi, Derek Vello
CPSO#:
68950
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Estonian
Education: McMaster University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
700 Gordon Street West
Whitby
Whitby ON L1N 5S9
Phone: (416) 528-8501
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences |
Whitby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEREK VELLO PALLANDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALLANDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2000 |