THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:34:28 AM
Schemmer, Drew Clifford
CPSO#:
68940
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Feb 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Radiology Consultants
11 Lakeside Terr
Barrie ON L4M 0H9
Phone: (705) 726-5759
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
North Bay General Hospital,Civic Site |
North Bay |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DREW CLIFFORD SCHEMMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHEMMER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2000 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2021 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2022 |