THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:31:16 PM
McNeil, Bernadette
CPSO#:
68922
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Paul Family Health Network
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre
4th Floor
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford ON N3S 6T6
Phone: (519) 756-6400
Fax: (519) 756-7343
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BERNADETTE MCNEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNEIL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Nov 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Dec 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 07 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 08 Sep 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 1998 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2003 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 13, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
ARP CPD 2018 - Dr. McNeil in now enrolled with CFPC.