THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:54:10 PM
Doctor, Shaheen Saifuddin
CPSO#:
68918
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 May 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Room 3S-106
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6444 Ext. 4477
Fax: (416) 342-1770
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Nov 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAHEEN SAIFUDDIN DOCTOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOCTOR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2000 |