THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:24:35 PM
Dokainish, Hisham
CPSO#:
68917
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Sep 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian, Spanish
Education: McMaster University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
C-1160 Blair Rd
Burlington ON L7M 1K9
Phone: 9053313101
Fax: 905-319-2499
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:13 Sep 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HISHAM DOKAINISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOKAINISH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 1999 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2022 |