THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:58:03 AM
Gambarotto, Kathryn Rose
CPSO#:
68913
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Sep 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Main St W
4th Floor
Hamilton ON L8P 1H6
Phone: 905-525-9140 Ext. 24881
Fax: 905-527-8847
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Sep 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATHRYN ROSE GAMBAROTTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMBAROTTO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 1999 |