THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:13:53 PM
Lawlis, Catherine Maria
CPSO#:
68904
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Feb 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300-1100 Burloak Dr
Burlington ON L7L 6B2
Phone: 416-777-9933
Electoral District: 04
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS
1-888-563-3732, extension1 www.recordsolutions.ca/DrLawlis
Date Received: 03 May 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Feb 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARIA LAWLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWLIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 28 Feb 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 28 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Feb 1999 |