THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:31:33 AM
Pelletier, Annette Marie
CPSO#:
68887
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Dec 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Caldbick, Annette Marie (used until: 30 Sep 2008 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Annette Pelletier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: March 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On March 27, 2018, Riverside Health Care notified the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, pursuant to s. 85.5 (2)2 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act and s. 33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act, that Dr. Annette Marie Pelletier resigned her privileges at Riverside Health Care Facilities, during the course of an investigation into her practice.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1997 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jan 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: January 11, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Annette Marie Pelletier to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 11, 2019:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Pelletier failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Pelletier resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)