THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:52:12 AM
Petter, Tanya
CPSO#:
68882
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Nov 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Nov 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
233 Major Street
Toronto ON M5S 2L5
Phone: (416)436-6195
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TANYA PETTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2000 |