THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:42:05 PM
Samis, Andrew James Willis
CPSO#:
68880
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Oct 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care - BGH
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES WILLIS SAMIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2000 |