THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:58:55 PM
Tran, Quoc Hung
CPSO#:
68876
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Vietnamese
Education: Queen's University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
#1-180 McNaughton Ave. W
Chatham ON N7M 4Z7
Phone: (519)354-6440
Fax: 519-397-3061
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. QUOC HUNG TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1999 |