THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:39:19 AM
Watterson, James David
CPSO#:
68875
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa General Hospital
Box 222
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8373
Fax: (613) 739-6719
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES DAVID WATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATTERSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2000 |