THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:15:41 PM
Chopra, Nikhil
CPSO#:
68846
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Mar 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Mar 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
411 - 450 Central Ave
London ON N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 435-0415
Fax: (519) 435-1862
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site |
Petrolia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:11 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NIKHIL CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2000 |