THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:37:50 AM
Dykeman, Ronald Wade
CPSO#:
68832
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Sep 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Sep 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Occupational Health Department
General Motors of Canada
1908 Colonel Sam Drive
Oshawa ON L1H 8P7
Phone: (905) 644-3737
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Occupational Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RONALD WADE DYKEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYKEMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Occupational Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Occupational Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Occupational Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Occupational Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Occupational Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2000 |