THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 12:21:54 PM
MacAskill, Kimberly Ruth
CPSO#:
68831
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Sep 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Ibbotson, Kimberly Ruth (used until: 29 Sep 1997 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
West End Family Care
2-80 Michael Cowpland Dr
Kanata ON K2M 1P6
Phone: 613 599 3321
Fax: 613 599 3366
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Sep 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY RUTH MACASKILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACASKILL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 24 Nov 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 25 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 1997 |