THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:35:52 AM
Pasternak, Stephen Howard
CPSO#:
68821
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cognitive Neurology Rm A2 - 127
Parkwood Institute Main Building
St. Joseph's Health Care London
550 Wellington
London ON N6C 0A7
Phone: 519 646-6032
Fax: 519 646-6226
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:31 May 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHEN HOWARD PASTERNAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASTERNAK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 14 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 15 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Resident 1 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2001 |