THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:15:24 AM
Wei, Alice Chia-Chi
CPSO#:
68818
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Alice C. Wei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:C-866A
1275 York Ave
New York NY 10065
Tel: 212-639-5643
Fax: 929-321-1060
Date Received: 29 Jan 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2019 |