THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 6:16:17 AM
Jolly, Shivinder Singh
CPSO#:
68788
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Oct 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Oct 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Ottawa, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
unit 408-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2J 0C1
Phone: 5197432573
Fax: 597432792
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:07 Sep 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHIVINDER SINGH JOLLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOLLY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 1999 |