THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 23:21:00 PM
Lachapelle, Kevin Robert
CPSO#:
68787
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2 - 1 Frankford Cres
Trenton ON K8V 6H8
Phone: (613) 965-5777
Fax: (613) 965-4253
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial |
Trenton |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN ROBERT LACHAPELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACHAPELLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2000 |