THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:37:05 PM
Needham-Nethercott, Natalie Louise
CPSO#:
68785
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2631
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATALIE LOUISE NEEDHAM-NETHERCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEEDHAM-NETHERCOTT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1999 |