THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:15:21 PM
Chopra, Priya
CPSO#:
68760
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 May 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 May 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 228
284 Queen St. East
Brampton ON L6V 1C2
Phone: (905) 866-6462
Fax: (647) 361-8608
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PRIYA CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 17 Nov 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2001 |